California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1198 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1198AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 27, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff (Coauthors: Senators Cogdill, Denham, Dutton, Harman, Hollingsworth, and Runner) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Gilmore, Jeffries, Knight, Silva, and Smyth) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend  Sections 25213 and 25402   Section 25213  of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1198, as amended, Huff. Energy: State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: regulations. The Warren-Alquist State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Act requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to adopt those regulations that are necessary to carry out the act. The act also requires the commission, after one or more public hearings, to prescribe, by regulation, standards for minimum levels of operating efficiency and prescribe other measures, such as energy and water consumption labeling not preempted by federal labeling law  ,  to promote the use of energy and water efficient appliances that do not result in any added total costs for consumers over the designed life of the appliances concerned. This bill would  prohibit the implementation of   provide that  the television product labeling  requirement   regulations  adopted by the commission  unless   would not be effective until July 1, 2011, and if  the United States Federal Trade Commission fails to issue a final labeling rule for  that product  those products  as of July 1, 2011.  The bill further provides that those regulations   would remain in effect only until the Federal Trade Commission issues a final labeling rule for television products.   This bill would, for all appliance standards that are effective as of January 1, 2011, require that discount rates, payback calculations, and life cycle cost estimates use interest rates applicable to consumer financing and the average life of the product before replacement.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25213 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25213. (a) The commission shall adopt rules and regulations, as necessary, to carry out the provisions of this division in conformity with the provisions of Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code. The commission shall make available to a person upon request copies of proposed regulations, together with summaries of reasons supporting their adoption.  (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), the television product labeling requirement adopted by the commission shall not be implemented unless the United States Federal Trade Commission fails to issue a final labeling rule for that product as of July 1, 2011.   (b) (1) Notwithstanding any other law, the television product labeling regulations adopted by the commission shall not take effect, and the commission shall not enforce those regulations, before July 1, 2011.   (2) On and after July 1, 2011, the television product labeling regulations shall be effective if the Federal Trade Commission fails to issue a final labeling rule for television products before July 1, 2011, and shall remain in effect until the Federal Trade Commission issues a final labeling rule for television products.  All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Senate, April 12, 2010. (JR11)