04/21/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/14/2010 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |