|
09/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4906.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6368.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (June 29 amended measure version corrected July 13.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 3733.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3673.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3297.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|