08/23/2010 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
08/20/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6441.) To third reading. | |||
08/19/2010 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |||
08/18/2010 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Saldana. | |||
06/28/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on E. & R. | |||
05/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 5. Page 3650.) To Assembly. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3102.) | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |