|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4906.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6362.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3730.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3673.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3102.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|