|
09/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4926.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6678.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6429.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3701.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3673.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3300.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3103.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|