|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2199.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 794.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 382.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|