California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB121 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 121AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Denham  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Gilmore   )  FEBRUARY 3, 2009 An act to amend Section 14183 of the Penal Code, relating to crime prevention. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 121, as amended, Denham. Central Coast Rural Crime Prevention Program. Existing law authorizes specified counties, until July 1, 2010, to develop the Central Coast Rural Crime Prevention Program, as specified. This bill would extend the authorized operation of the program until  either July 1, 2011, or  July 1, 2013  , as specified  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14183 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 14183. This title shall become inoperative on July 1,  2011   2013  , and is repealed as of  January 1, 2012, unless pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 10752.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, the Director of Finance makes the notification specified therein, in which case this title shall become inoperative on July 1, 2013, and is repealed as of  January 1, 2014, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before  January 1, 2012, or January 1, 2014, as applicable, deletes   January 1, 2014, deletes  or extends those dates.