|
09/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4650.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6179.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Coms. on INS. and JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3480.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3306.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|