06/24/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Leno. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 14. Page 3794.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3795.) | |||
06/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3300.) | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |