05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/23/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/25/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 40. Noes 23. Page 161.) | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |