|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 519, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6828.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6673.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3705.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|