06/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 3653.) To Assembly. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/04/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
05/03/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3310.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |