California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1217 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/18/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1217CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 155 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 18, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 29, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Public Employment and Retirement (Senators Correa (Chair), Ashburn, Corbett, Cox, Ducheny, and Liu) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to repeal and add Section 12479 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1217, Committee on Public Employment and Retirement. State government: warrants: employee designees. Existing law authorizes an employee of the state to designate a person who, upon the death of the employee, is entitled to receive all warrants that would have been payable to the deceased employee had that employee survived. This bill would repeal and recast this provision to additionally authorize an employee of the state to designate a primary person and up to 3 contingent persons for receipt of employee warrants upon death. This bill would require, if the first-designated person predeceases the employee, that the next-designated contingent person who survives the employee receive these warrants. This bill would specify that a corporation, a trust, or an estate may be a designated "person," entitled to receive these warrants pursuant to this provision. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12479 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 12479 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12479. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, an employee of the state may file with his or her appointing power a designation of a person or persons for receipt of employee warrants upon death. The designation shall control who is entitled to receive the warrants that would have been payable to the decedent had he or she survived. (b) An employee may designate a primary person and up to three contingent persons pursuant to this section. The first-designated person shall be the designated person that receives the warrants. If the first-designated person predeceases the employee, the next-listed designated person who survives the employee shall be the designated person that receives the warrants. (c) The appropriate designated person shall claim the warrants from the appointing power. Upon sufficient proof of identity, the appointing power shall deliver the warrants to the claimant. A designated person who receives warrants pursuant to this section shall be entitled to negotiate the warrants as if he or she were the payee. (d) The employee may change the designation from time to time. (e) For purposes of this section, "person" includes, but is not limited to, a corporation, a trust, or an estate.