|
02/01/2010
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 683.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Set for hearing March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|