|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4650.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6179.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3477.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3445.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|