|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6056.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3119.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3001.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|