09/29/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/29/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/16/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 6229.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 3697.) To Assembly. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 3540.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 3540.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3403.) | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |