|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4651.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3379.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3184.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|