|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6291.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 3583.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3429.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|