|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6361.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3743.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3673.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3184.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3102.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on E., R., & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|