06/15/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/03/2010 | To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. | |||
05/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3656.) To Assembly. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/17/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/07/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3303.) | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/25/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |