|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5101.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6934.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6608.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3704.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3303.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3103.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|