05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3300.) | |||
04/13/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3085.) | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A. (March 25 amended version corrected March 31.) | |||
03/23/2010 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Coms. on F. & A. and EQ. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |