|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 522, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3584.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3499.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3306.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on L. & I.R. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|