06/21/2010 | Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/02/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3743.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3673.) | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/26/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3311.) | |||
04/06/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |