|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4945.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6334.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on August 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6079.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6051.) Assembly Rule 56 (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Page 6051.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4201.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Set for hearing June 28.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3921.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Set for hearing June 15.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|