|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6329.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6101.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3789.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3674.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3186.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|