07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/21/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |||
06/17/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/17/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5698.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/03/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly. | |||
04/28/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |