|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 643, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4932.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6677.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6430.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3413.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3335.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3069.)
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|