|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3627.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (April 28 amended version corrected May 4.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3295.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3211.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|