07/19/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/19/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4201.) To enrollment. | |||
06/30/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5843.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
05/03/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) To Assembly. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3016.) | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |