|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5739.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3086.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|