|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5008.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 6758.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6352.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 6328.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 3656.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3547.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3165.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|