05/17/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/19/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3306.) | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
04/14/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/19/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |