|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 4. Page 4890.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 6540.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3702.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3674.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3185.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3104.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|