|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6845.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6690.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 10.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1136.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 874.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|