|
08/18/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6055.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3379.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3185.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|