|
08/30/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 47. Noes. 29. Page 6841.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 36. Page 6873.) From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 30.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 38. Page 6610.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Nava.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 7.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3785.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 5. Page 3752.) Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3692.) Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3594.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3305.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|