05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3309.) | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/11/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |