07/01/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
06/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3704.) To Assembly. | |||
05/27/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/26/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3428.) | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/08/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |