LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1283
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1283
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1283
Compare Versions
SB1283 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1283 Amended August 19, 2010
SB1283 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1283 Amended May 28, 2010
SB1283 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1283 Amended April 8, 2010
SB1283 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1283 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1283 Amended August 19, 2010
SB1283 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1283 Amended May 28, 2010
SB1283 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1283 Amended April 8, 2010
SB1283 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare