05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/07/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
05/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |