02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/20/2010 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
01/20/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
08/27/2009 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/25/2009 | Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.) | |||
08/17/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
08/13/2009 | Set for hearing August 17. | |||
07/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1813.) Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/08/2009 | Set for hearing July 15. | |||
06/23/2009 | Set for hearing July 8. | |||
06/18/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/12/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2009 | Set for hearing March 18. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/06/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |||
02/05/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |