06/24/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Leno. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 13. Page 3795.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3795.) | |||
06/01/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3674.) | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3300.) | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |