06/30/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.) | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/02/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3743.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3674.) | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3300.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |