|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6055.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3483.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3186.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|