|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 3624.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3428.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3183.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|