05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/23/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3186.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/06/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |