05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/27/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/26/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3183.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |